U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01289
  • Case Name: Warren Real Estate Holdings Inc v. Sinclair Construction Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 26, 2025: [Docket]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Counterclaim]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.