U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shelton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • April 29, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 02, 2025: [Unseal Case]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket]
January, 2025
  • January 12, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.