U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00520-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ibarra Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • April 04, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 04, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.