U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00494-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Docket]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.