U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00734
  • Case Name: NGO Love LLC v. Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 03, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.