U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01104
  • Case Name: Nassau Life Insurance Company v. SDM Holdings LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.