U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00358-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Jiang et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 12, 2025: [Advisement to Court - Notice]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: [Advisement to Court - Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.