U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-00465
  • Case Name: Clerkley v. City of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 15, 2025: [New Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Costs]
  • April 01, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Jury Verdict]
  • March 17, 2025: [Court Exhibit]
  • March 17, 2025: [Court Jury Instructions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 17, 2025: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sealed Response]
  • March 13, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • March 13, 2025: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • March 13, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2025: [Response to Non - Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.