U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00170
  • Case Name: Freeman v. Community Strategies Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 13, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.