U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01083
  • Case Name: Lebeda v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remand to Agency]
  • April 15, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Social Security Opening Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.