U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01144
  • Case Name: Alexander v. Orrklahoma East LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 30, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Docket]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.