U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00253
  • Case Name: Shelton v. Health Care Service Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 04, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.