U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00525
  • Case Name: Inda v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 28, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 28, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 14, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.