U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00192
  • Case Name: Nguyen v. Trans Union LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 11, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.