U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01018
  • Case Name: Wright v. US Department of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to Amend]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.