U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Melodick v. Garland
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set Aside]
  • April 23, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 14, 2025: [Docket]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.