U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00202-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Akinsanya
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order for Response]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order for Response]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.