U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Joint Discovery Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appearance Bond]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2025: [DPPA-Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.