U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00141-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Escobar et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Other Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.