U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Dugan v. Boston Digital Enterprises LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
  • April 21, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 15, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.