U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Huskins et al v. Clarity Telecom LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Docket]
  • March 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.