U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Holland v. Kutz et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.