U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00968
  • Case Name: Biton v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Contempt]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sanctions]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Contempt]
  • March 24, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Writ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.