U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Barlow et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Docket]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Surreply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 13, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.