U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Pizza Inn Inc v. Allens Dynamic Food Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed on Garnishee]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2025: [Affidavit of Garnishment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed on Garnishee]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed on Garnishee]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.