U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00917
  • Case Name: Mathis et al v. Rutherford et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.