U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00427
  • Case Name: Strover v. Mears Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.