U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00309
  • Case Name: McGuire v. Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 30, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 12, 2025: [Previous Cases]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.