U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00307
  • Case Name: Frankfurt Short Bruza Associates PC v. Semtner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Receipt]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Report Regarding Copyright or Patent and Trademark]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.