U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00430
  • Case Name: United States of America et al v. Joint Technology, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 29, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.