U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00715
  • Case Name: Cadena v. Rock Ridge Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Docket]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Compel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 21, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 21, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • March 17, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • March 13, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 12, 2025: [Leave]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.