U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.