U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Docket]
  • April 01, 2025: [Joint Discovery Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [DPPA-Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.