U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waive and File Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.