U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00324
  • Case Name: Robbins v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 03, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 21, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.