U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mullin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Docket]
  • April 07, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waive and File Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Information - Felony]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.