U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-01148
  • Case Name: Brown v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Exclude]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • April 21, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 10, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 07, 2025: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • April 07, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Exclude]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.