U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00306
  • Case Name: Nsikak v. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 08, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.