U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01365
  • Case Name: Abira Medical Laboratories LLC v. Blue Cross Blue Shield Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.