U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00334
  • Case Name: Coover et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Remand]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.