U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nguyen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.