U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00336
  • Case Name: Royal v. Wagner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 06, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 24, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.