U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00852
  • Case Name: Hutchins v. Gourley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 15, 2025: [Add Party]
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.