U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10310
  • Case Name: Barry Dean Prince and Betty Viola Prince
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Auto Discharge Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [(auto) Chapter 7 Trustee Report of No Distribution - no funds]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [Reaffirmation Agreement Note - Chambers]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gould, Douglas N. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors Continued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.