U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10805
  • Case Name: Anderson C Allen and Bambi M Allen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Notice of Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Statement of Declination]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Notice of Case Reassignment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Minute Order Requesting Case Reassignment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kramer, Kim [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.