U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10841
  • Case Name: CHRISTINA RENEE BOCKO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [Show Cause]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [Documents Past Due]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [(auto) Chapter 7 Trustee Report of No Distribution - no funds]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [Amended Meeting of Creditors Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee - Form 103B]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [No Money at Case Filing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [Dropbox/EDSS/eSR Notes]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Dropbox/EDSS/eSR Notes]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mashburn, John D. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee - Form 103B]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee - Form 103B]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.