U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01312
  • Case Name: Balfour v. Griswold et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Refer Case to ADR]
  • April 28, 2025: [Refer Case to ADR]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.