U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10398-T
  • Case Name: Laurie Ann Dorsey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Abandon]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Payment Advices Certification]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.