U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80135
  • Case Name: Jaimi Lynn Welch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors (Batch)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [Hearing Set (Reaffirmation Agreement)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [Motion for Court Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loud,, Trustee Kelley G [Deficient Reaffirmation Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.