U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10202-T
  • Case Name: Todd Wesley Frankenfield and Holly Marie Frankenfield
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Abandon]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Extend or Shorten Time]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Extend or Shorten Time]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Malloy, Patrick J. [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.